NH HB177 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB177
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the calculation of stabilization grants.
Title
Relative to the calculation of stabilization grants.
Sponsors
Rep. Roderick Ladd [R] | Rep. Barbara Shaw [D] | Rep. Steven Smith [R] | Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] |
Rep. Werner Horn [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Rep. Dan Wolf [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - OTPA (Y: 268 N: 90 NV: 10 Abs: 32) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-10-02 | House | Division II Work Session: 10/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2019-03-27 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-03-22 | House | Executive Session: 03/27/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-03-06 | House | Finance Division II Work Session: 03/13/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 209 |
2019-02-28 | House | Finance Division II Work Session: 03/04/2019 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Finance 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 47 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0258h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 268-90 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 45 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0258h: Amendment Adopted DV 260-96 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 45 |
2019-02-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0258h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 17 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 40 |
Same As/Similar To
HB177 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)