NH HB1772 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 179-128 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 179-128 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 62
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting online voting registration.
Title
Permitting online voting registration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - ITL (Y: 179 N: 128 NV: 42 Abs: 43) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 179-128 03/15/2018 House Journal 8 P. 62 |
2018-03-08 | House | Special Order to 3/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 7 P. 49 |
2018-03-08 | House | Suspend House Rule 65 (Reps. Hinch, Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote by necessary two-thirds vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 125 |
2018-02-28 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0598h (NT) |
2018-02-28 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 67 |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-11-30 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 P. 23 |