NH HB1775 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 307; I. Sec. 2 eff. 6/30/2019; II. Rem. eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 307; I. Sec. 2 eff. 6/30/2019; II. Rem. eff. 1/1/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the appointment of guardians ad litem in parenting cases and relative to alcohol and drug free housing.
Title
Relative to the appointment of guardians ad litem in parenting cases and relative to alcohol and drug free housing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 307; I. Sec. 2 eff. 6/30/2019; II. Rem. eff. 1/1/2019 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 1970c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-1970c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-1970c; 05/15/2018 |
2018-05-11 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/14/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, Gannon, Lasky; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. K. Rice, Itse, M. Pearson, P. Long 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1587s and 1846s and Requests CofC (Rep. K. Rice): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1846s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. D'Allesandro Floor Amendment # 2018-1846s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19A |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1587s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1587s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1587s, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/29/2018, Room 100, State House, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0671h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0671h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 7 |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0671h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 5 |
2018-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 02/13/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206 |
2017-11-30 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 1 P. 23 |