NH HB1779 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 166-158 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 110
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 166-158 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 110
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring monitoring of certain radioactive air pollutants.
Title
Requiring monitoring of certain radioactive air pollutants.
Sponsors
Rep. Mindi Messmer [D] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Robert Backus [D] | Rep. Henry Marsh [R] |
Rep. Tamara Le [D] | Rep. Valerie Fraser [R] | Rep. James McConnell [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - ITL (Y: 166 N: 158 NV: 39 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 166-158 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 110 |
2018-02-21 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-02-21 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 13-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 48 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 23 |