NH HB1781 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-02 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to condominiums with 10 or fewer residential units.
Title
Relative to condominiums with 10 or fewer residential units.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 04/24/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 20 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 11 |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-12-01 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 23 |