NH HB179 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-21 - House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 4 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-21 - House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 4 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a task force to study the formula for determining adequate education grants to school districts.
Title
Establishing a task force to study the formula for determining adequate education grants to school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-21 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 4 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar) | |
2011-10-04 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/18/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-09-09 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/20/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-02-24 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.823 | |
2011-02-18 | House Executive Session: 2/24/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-01-19 | House Public Hearing: 1/27/2011 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-01-11 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Education; House Journal 11, PG. 175 |