NH HB1796 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 253; Eff. 8/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-18 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 253; Eff. 8/11/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the legislative oversight committee on electric utility restructuring.
Title
Relative to the legislative oversight committee on electric utility restructuring.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-18 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/12/2018; Chapter 253; Eff. 8/11/2018 |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1798s (Rep. Barry): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1798s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1798s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1798s, 05/02/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/27/2018, Room 103, State House, 10:05 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 55 |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 31 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 02/14/2018 Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-02-06 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/14/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 01:45 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-12-07 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 24 |