NH HB1805 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 203; I. Sections 6 & 7 eff. 7/1/2018; II. Rem. eff. 6/8/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 203; I. Sections 6 & 7 eff. 7/1/2018; II. Rem. eff. 6/8/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study level dollar amortization of retirement system unfunded accrued liability and relative to the retirement system board of trustees.
Title
Establishing a committee to study level dollar amortization of retirement system unfunded accrued liability and relative to the retirement system board of trustees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 203; I. Sections 6 & 7 eff. 7/1/2018; II. Rem. eff. 6/8/2018 |
2018-05-15 | House | Enrolled 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-15 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Hearing: 04/25/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0539h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 41 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0539h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 41 |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0539h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 23 |
2018-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-15 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-14 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2018-0539h: 02/20/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-13 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/14/2018 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-11 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 02/13/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-12-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 24 |