NH HB1808 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 204; Eff. 7/1/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 204; Eff. 7/1/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing certain inactive dedicated funds.
Title
Repealing certain inactive dedicated funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Norman Major [R] | Rep. Susan Almy [D] | Rep. Neal Kurk [R] | Rep. Lynne Ober [R] |
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. James Gray [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-13 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 204; Eff. 7/1/2018 |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1811e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/26/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-1811e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/12/2018; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing: 04/03/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0471h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 51 |
2018-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2018-0471h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 51 |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0471h for 02/22/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 21 |
2018-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2018 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-02-01 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/06/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-01-25 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/30/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-12-14 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 24 |