NH HB1810 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 95; I. Sec. 2 eff. 11/30/2019; II. Rem. eff. 5/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 95; I. Sec. 2 eff. 11/30/2019; II. Rem. eff. 5/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study the effectiveness of the current statutes related to management of non-tidal public water ways and the construction or placement of structures within them.
Title
Establishing a commission to study the effectiveness of the current statutes related to management of non-tidal public water ways and the construction or placement of structures within them.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 95; I. Sec. 2 eff. 11/30/2019; II. Rem. eff. 5/25/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Hearing: 04/10/2018, Room 103, State House, 09:50 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0340h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 54 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0340h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 54 |
2018-02-21 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0340h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 31 |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-02-08 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/13/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2017-12-14 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 24 |