NH HB184 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB184
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the calculation of kindergarten students in the average daily membership and repealing prorated kindergarten funding based on Keno revenues.
Title
Relative to the calculation of kindergarten students in the average daily membership and repealing prorated kindergarten funding based on Keno revenues.
Sponsors
Rep. David Luneau [D] | Rep. Mary Wallner [D] | Rep. David Huot [D] | Rep. Linda Tanner [D] |
Sen. Dan Feltes [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - OTP (Y: 203 N: 148 NV: 18 Abs: 31) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 11/12/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-10-02 | House | Division II Work Session: 10/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2019-03-14 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2019-02-27 | House | Finance Division II Work Session: 03/01/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Finance 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 50 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-148 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 47 |
2019-02-12 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-02-12 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 17 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-12-26 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 40 |
Same As/Similar To
HB184 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)