NH HB189 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2019; Chapter 151; Eff: 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2019; Chapter 151; Eff: 01/01/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an exemption from criminal penalties for child sex trafficking victims.
Title
Establishing an exemption from criminal penalties for child sex trafficking victims.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Massimilla [D] | Rep. Phyllis Katsakiores [R] | Rep. Latha Mangipudi [D] | Rep. Timothy Smith [D] |
Rep. Karen Ebel [D] | Rep. Patricia Klee [D] | Sen. Erin Hennessey [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-03 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2019; Chapter 151; Eff: 01/01/2020 |
2019-06-12 | House | Enrolled 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 47 |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/23/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/02/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-01-31 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 4 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/31/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 3 |
2019-01-10 | House | Executive Session: 01/17/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-01-09 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-01-02 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/09/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-12-26 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 40 |