NH HB190 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing gold and silver as lawful mediums of exchange.
Title
Allowing gold and silver as lawful mediums of exchange.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/31/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 2 |
2019-01-15 | House | Executive Session: 01/22/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/22/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-12-26 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 40 |