NH HB221 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-10-25 - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/06/2019 12:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Renaming Columbus Day as Indigenous People's Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Renaming Columbus Day as Indigenous People's Day.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-25HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 11/06/2019 12:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-10-23HouseExecutive Session: 11/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-09-20HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/02/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-02-20HouseRetained in Committee
2019-02-13House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/19/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306
2019-02-05House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/12/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/09/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building306
2018-12-27HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 41

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback