NH HB221 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB221
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Renaming Columbus Day as Indigenous People's Day.
Title
Renaming Columbus Day as Indigenous People's Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-08 - House - Table (Y: 179 N: 178 NV: 21 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-01-09 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Cali-Pitts): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 179-178 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 108 |
2019-11-13 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation (Vote ; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 22 |
2019-10-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 11/06/2019 12:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-10-23 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-09-20 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/02/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-02-20 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/19/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-02-05 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/12/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/09/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building306 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 41 |
Same As/Similar To
HB221 (Carry Over) 2019-11-13 - Committee Report: Without Recommendation (Vote ; Regular Calendar)