NH HB227 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the length of time an employer may lease an employee through an employee leasing company.
Title
Relative to the length of time an employer may lease an employee through an employee leasing company.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 17 |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/14/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 8 |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 2 P. 42 |