NH HB229 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to rulemaking requirements of the department of corrections.
Title
Relative to rulemaking requirements of the department of corrections.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Schmidt [D] | Rep. Edith Tucker [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] | Rep. Tom Dolan [R] |
Rep. Christy Bartlett [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 23 |
2019-03-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/19/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 8 |
2019-03-05 | House | Executive Session: 03/13/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 03/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-16 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/23/2019 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building306 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 42 |