NH HB233 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor on 6/26/2015; Chapter 162; Effective Date 8/25/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - Signed by the Governor on 6/26/2015; Chapter 162; Effective Date 8/25/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to local approval of mining activity.
Title
Relative to local approval of mining activity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | House | Signed by the Governor on 6/26/2015; Chapter 162; Effective Date 8/25/2015 |
2015-06-18 | House | Enrolled (in recess of 6/11/2015); House Journal 46, PG. 1993 |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 6/11/2015); Senate Journal 19 |
2015-06-03 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1734s (Rep J. Belanger): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 44, PG. 1813 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1734s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 15 |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1734s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1734s, 5/21/15; Senate Calendar 22 |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Hearing: 5/6/15, Room 100, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 20 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 9 |
2015-03-04 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 22, PG. 564 |
2015-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 4 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar18, PG. 348 |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-02-11 | House | Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 10:20 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 214 |