NH HB233 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Hearing: 04/30/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 20
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the group and individual health insurance market.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the group and individual health insurance market.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - OTPA (Y: 207 N: 140 NV: 13 Abs: 40) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateHearing: 04/30/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 20
2019-03-29SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0490h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-140 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 56
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-0490h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 56
2019-03-14HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-14HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0490h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 19
2019-02-07House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-02-06HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-29House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 104
2019-01-15HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2018-12-27HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 42

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback