NH HB233 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB233
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the group and individual health insurance market.
Title
Relative to the group and individual health insurance market.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/08/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24A |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Hearing: 04/30/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0490h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 207-140 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 56 |
2019-03-19 | House | Amendment # 2019-0490h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 56 |
2019-03-14 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-03-14 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0490h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 19 |
2019-02-07 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/13/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2019-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 42 |
Same As/Similar To
HB233 (Carry Over) 2019-11-21 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar