NH HB233 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB233
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-27 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-27 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the right of any infant born alive to medically appropriate and reasonable care and treatment.
Title
Relative to the right of any infant born alive to medically appropriate and reasonable care and treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - ITL (Y: 46 N: 186 NV: 118 Abs: 48) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - Table (Y: 45 N: 184 NV: 121 Abs: 48) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - Special Order (Y: 180 N: 159 NV: 17 Abs: 42) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - ITL (Y: 0 N: 15 NV: 354 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - Table (Y: 0 N: 13 NV: 356 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - Special Order (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 359 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - ITL (Y: 46 N: 186 NV: 118 Abs: 48) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - Table (Y: 45 N: 184 NV: 121 Abs: 48) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - Special Order (Y: 180 N: 159 NV: 17 Abs: 42) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - ITL (Y: 0 N: 15 NV: 354 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - Table (Y: 0 N: 13 NV: 356 Abs: 29) [FAIL]
2021-02-26 - House - Special Order (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 359 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17 |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/27/2021; Senate Calendar 25A |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 03/30/2021, 01:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Introduced 03/04/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2021-02-24 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Spillane): Motion Failed DV 44-188 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 98 |
2021-02-24 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 181-49 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 98 |
2021-02-24 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Failed Regular Calendar 46-186 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 96 |
2021-02-24 | House | Limit Debate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote House Journal 3 P. 96 |
2021-02-24 | House | Recommit (Rep. Griffith): Motion Failed DV 40-186 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 96 |
2021-02-24 | House | Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Griffith): Motion Failed DV 43-188 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 96 |
2021-02-24 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Griffith): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 45-184 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 94 |
2021-02-24 | House | Special Order to next order of business (Rep. Osborne): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 180-159 02/24/2021 House Journal 3 P. 90 |
2021-02-18 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-02-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 31 |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/10/2021 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91322816360 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-09 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 40 |
Same As/Similar To
HB233 (Carry Over) 2021-05-27 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17