NH HB236 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-07 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the penalties for passing a school bus.
Title
Relative to the penalties for passing a school bus.
Sponsors
Rep. James Spillane [R] | Rep. Werner Horn [R] | Rep. John Potucek [R] | Rep. Betty Gay [R] |
Rep. Alan Bershtein [R] | Rep. Richard Hinch [R] | Rep. John Janigian [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2019 House Journal 8 P. 9 |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/07/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 6 |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive Session: 02/26/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 42 |