NH HB243 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 256; Eff: 04/30/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-24 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 256; Eff: 04/30/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to membership of the Pease development authority board of directors.
Title
Relative to membership of the Pease development authority board of directors.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2019; Chapter 256; Eff: 04/30/2021 |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-27 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 53 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2205s (Rep. Cloutier): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 11 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2205s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2019-2205s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2205s, 05/30/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | ==RESCHEDULED== Hearing: 05/16/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 21 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 05/15/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0050h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 20 |
2019-02-14 | House | Amendment # 2019-0050h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 20 |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0050h (NT) for 02/14/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 10 |
2019-01-30 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-01-16 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/22/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/15/2019 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Public Works and Highways House Journal 2 P. 42 |