NH HB251 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB251
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study criminal records check policies for nonpublic schools and private entities that receive public funds.
Title
Establishing a committee to study criminal records check policies for nonpublic schools and private entities that receive public funds.
Sponsors
Rep. Linda Tanner [D] | Rep. Joseph Guthrie [R] | Rep. Connie Van Houten [D] | Rep. Janice Schmidt [D] |
Rep. Patricia Cornell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/17/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-01-08 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2776h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 36 |
2020-01-08 | House | Amendment # 2019-2776h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 36 |
2019-10-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2776h (NT) (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 10/23/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-10-02 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/21/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-09-25 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/17/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-03-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-29 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2019 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-23 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 01/24/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2019-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/22/2019 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 207 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Education House Journal 2 P. 43 |
Same As/Similar To
HB251 (Carry Over) 2019-10-31 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2776h (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar)