NH HB255 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-01-31 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to shift differential pay for employees who work overnight.
Title
Relative to shift differential pay for employees who work overnight.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-31 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 5 |
2019-01-24 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/31/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 5 |
2019-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 01/23/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 2 P. 43 |