NH HB263 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-11-18 - Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study examination of elderly drivers.
Title
Establishing a committee to study examination of elderly drivers.
Sponsors
Rep. Tara Sad [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-11-18 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2013-11-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-2282h for Jan 8 (Vote 15-3; Regular Calendar) |
2013-10-15 | House | ==TIME CHANGE==Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/29/2013 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-10-15 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/29/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-08-28 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/24/2013 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-02-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2013-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 2/5/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 12, PG.189 |