NH HB263 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-18 - Died on the Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting residency restrictions on sex offenders.
Title
Prohibiting residency restrictions on sex offenders.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Robertson [D] | Rep. Cynthia Chase [D] | Rep. Geoffrey Hirsch [D] | Rep. Susan Emerson [R] |
Rep. June Frazer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-18 | House | Died on the Table |
2015-03-12 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Webb): Motion Adopted DV 203-106; House Journal 26, PG. 1264 |
2015-03-12 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep Webb); House Journal 24, PG. 766 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 11 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 395 |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 215 |