NH HB263 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB263
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-31 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-10-31 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to facilities licenses for charitable gaming.
Title
Relative to facilities licenses for charitable gaming.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-12 | House | Executive Session: 10/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-09-13 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-08-09 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-28 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2017 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-15 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/22/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-08 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-02 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/15/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/26/2017 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2017 10:40 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 22 |
Same As/Similar To
HB263 (Carry Over) 2017-10-31 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar)