NH HB263 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB263
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 290; Eff. 8/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 290; Eff. 8/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to facilities licenses for charitable gaming and relative to security requirements for games of chance.
Title
Relative to facilities licenses for charitable gaming and relative to security requirements for games of chance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 290; Eff. 8/24/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2025c: Adopted, DV 230-108 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2025c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-2025c; 05/17/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/15/2018 03:30 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Sanborn, Giuda, Feltes; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Lang, Abrami, Burns, Ames 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1784s and Requests CofC (Rep. Major): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1784s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1784s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1784s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19 |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Hearing: 03/14/2018, Room 100, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced 02/01/2018 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-01-03 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 46 |
2017-10-31 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-12 | House | Executive Session: 10/25/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-09-13 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-08-09 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/12/2017 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-28 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/28/2017 Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-15 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/22/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-08 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-02-02 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/15/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/26/2017 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2017 10:40 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 2 P. 22 |
Same As/Similar To
HB263 (Carry Over) 2017-10-31 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 01/03/2018 (Vote 23-0; Consent Calendar)