NH HB263 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-03 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to department of health and human services family reunification practices involving convicted sex offenders.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to department of health and human services family reunification practices involving convicted sex offenders.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-12-03SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study
2019-05-30SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-28SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24A
2019-05-16SenateHearing: 05/21/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 23
2019-03-29SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1029h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 2
2019-03-19HouseAmendment # 2019-1029h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 2
2019-03-13HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1029h for 03/19/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 3
2019-02-27HouseExecutive Session: 03/06/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 207
2019-02-26HousePublic Hearing: 03/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206
2018-12-28HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 2 P. 43

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback