NH HB267 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB267
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 291; Eff. 8/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 291; Eff. 8/24/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the New Hampshire transportation council.
Title
Establishing the New Hampshire transportation council.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/25/2018; Chapter 291; Eff. 8/24/2018 |
2018-06-05 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2092e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2092e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 1615s (Rep. Steven Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2018-1615s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2018-1615s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1615s, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/06/2018, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 9 |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced 02/01/2018 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 4 |
2018-01-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2404h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 42 |
2018-01-03 | House | Amendment # 2017-2404h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 42 |
2017-10-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2017-2404h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar) |
2017-10-11 | House | Executive Session: 10/18/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-09-06 | House | Retained Bill Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2017 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-09-06 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/26/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-08-23 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/05/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201 |
2017-08-16 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 08/22/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-05-09 | House | Retained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 05/17/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-02-22 | House | Retained in Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/21/2017 04:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-01-31 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 02/08/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2017-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2017 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2016-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/04/2017 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 22 |
Same As/Similar To
HB267 (Carry Over) 2017-10-26 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2017-2404h (NT) for 01/03/2018 (Vote 15-0; Consent Calendar)