NH HB268 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 49; Eff: 08/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 49; Eff: 08/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to real estate commissions paid to unlicensed entities.
Title
Relative to real estate commissions paid to unlicensed entities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 49; Eff: 08/04/2019 |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Hearing: 04/25/2019, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-01-31 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0036h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 3 |
2019-01-31 | House | Amendment # 2019-0036h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/31/2019 House Journal 4 P. 3 |
2019-01-22 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0036h for 01/31/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 2 |
2019-01-15 | House | Executive Session: 01/22/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/22/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 43 |