NH HB269 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-26 - House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2714h (New Title)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-26 - House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2714h (New Title)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a priority based budget system focused on measurable results.
Title
Establishing a priority based budget system focused on measurable results.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-26 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-2714h (New Title) | |
2011-10-26 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2714h(NT) for Jan 4 (Vote 17-4; Regular Calendar) | |
2011-10-13 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-10-13 | House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/27/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-10-13 | House ==CANCELLED== Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/20/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-09-14 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-09-14 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/6/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-09-08 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/29/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-09-08 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/22/2011 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 10:00 Amendment)== | |
2011-08-18 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/15/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-08-18 | House Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/8/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-03-01 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.824 | |
2011-02-23 | House Executive Session: 3/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-01-31 | House Public Hearing: 2/10/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-01-31 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 2/14/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 210-211 | |
2011-01-20 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Finance; House Journal 11, PG. 180 |