NH HB273 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB273
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-24 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-10-24 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to placement of a memorial honoring former representative Steve Vaillancourt of Manchester in the New Hampshire state house.
Title
Relative to placement of a memorial honoring former representative Steve Vaillancourt of Manchester in the New Hampshire state house.
Sponsors
Rep. Jean Jeudy [D] | Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-24 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) |
2019-10-02 | House | Executive Session: 10/22/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-09-18 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-02-05 | House | Retained in Committee |
2019-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2019-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 303 |
2018-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 2 P. 43 |
Same As/Similar To
HB273 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar)