NH HB277 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Sen. Cavanaugh Refused to Accede to House Request For C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to mental health parity under the insurance laws.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to mental health parity under the insurance laws.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - OTP (Y: 211 N: 141 NV: 8 Abs: 40) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13SenateSen. Cavanaugh Refused to Accede to House Request For C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/13/2019; Senate Journal 20
2019-06-11HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. Butler, Bartlett, Knirk, Hunt 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 42
2019-06-11HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2343s and Requests CofC (Rep. Butler): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 42
2019-05-30SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-2343s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-30SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-2343s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/30/2019; Senate Journal 18
2019-05-28SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-2343s, 05/30/2019; Senate Calendar 24A
2019-05-02SenateHearing: 05/07/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 21
2019-03-29SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 211-141 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 59
2019-03-14HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 19
2019-01-29HouseExecutive Session: 02/06/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-01-29HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/06/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 104
2019-01-15HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2018-12-28HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 43

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback