NH HB278 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/10/2019; Chapter 7; Eff: 07/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/10/2019; Chapter 7; Eff: 07/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the New Hampshire insurance department's annual hearing requirement.
Title
Relative to the New Hampshire insurance department's annual hearing requirement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/10/2019; Chapter 7; Eff: 07/09/2019 |
2019-04-25 | House | Enrolled 04/11/2019 House Journal 13 P. 127 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/25/2019); Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/11/2019; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/11/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 17 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/26/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0064h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 3 |
2019-02-27 | House | Amendment # 2019-0064h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 3 |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0064h for 02/27/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 3 |
2019-01-15 | House | Executive Session: 01/22/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/22/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building302 |
2018-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 44 |