NH HB280 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2556h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 15-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2556h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 15-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 27
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study the feasibility of placing medal decals on special number plates for veterans.
Title
Establishing a committee to study the feasibility of placing medal decals on special number plates for veterans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2556h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 15-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 27 |
2015-10-30 | House | Executive Session: 11/4/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-10-29 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 11/4/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-09-29 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/15/2015 9:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-09-21 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/29/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-05-13 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 5/20/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-02-18 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-02-10 | House | Public Hearing: 2/17/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 12, PG. 215 |