NH HB280 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/14/2019; Chapter 73; Eff: 06/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Designating the red-tailed hawk as the state raptor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the red-tailed hawk as the state raptor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - OTP (Y: 333 N: 11 NV: 23 Abs: 33) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-17HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/14/2019; Chapter 73; Eff: 06/14/2019
2019-06-12HouseEnrolled 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 47
2019-06-12SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1947s (Rep. Gourgue): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 11
2019-05-15SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-1947s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateSen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2019-1947s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateSpecial Order to the beginning of the calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-08SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-04-25SenateHearing: 05/08/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 20
2019-03-29SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-20HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 333-11 03/20/2019 House Journal 11 P. 2
2019-03-19HouseSpecial Order to first item of business on 3/20/2019 (Rep. Bixby): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 36
2019-03-11HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 20-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 25
2019-02-26HouseExecutive Session: 03/05/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 303
2019-02-26HousePublic Hearing: 03/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 303
2018-12-28HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 2 P. 44

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback