NH HB284 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/10/2019; Chapter 8; Eff: 07/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/10/2019; Chapter 8; Eff: 07/09/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to biennial controlled substance inventories conducted under the Controlled Drug Act.
Title
Relative to biennial controlled substance inventories conducted under the Controlled Drug Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/10/2019; Chapter 8; Eff: 07/09/2019 |
2019-04-12 | House | Enrolled 04/11/2019 House Journal 13 P. 125 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/11/2019); Senate Journal 13 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Hearing: 03/19/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-0133h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 16 |
2019-02-14 | House | Amendment # 2019-0133h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 16 |
2019-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0133h for 02/14/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 7 |
2019-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 01/29/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 2 P. 44 |