NH HB287 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 276-38; House Journal 29, PG.991-993
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 276-38; House Journal 29, PG.991-993
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminating voter identification requirements.
Title
Eliminating voter identification requirements.
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Rep. Marcia Moody [D] | Rep. Cynthia Chase [D] | Rep. Timothy Smith [D] |
Rep. Joel Winters [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - House - ITL (Y: 276 N: 38 NV: 46 Abs: 37) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 276-38; House Journal 29, PG.991-993 |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Mar 20 (Vote 12-6; Part II, Regular Calendar); House Calendar 23 PG.590 |
2013-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 3/5/2013 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-01-30 | House | Public Hearing: 2/5/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 12, PG.190 |