NH HB287 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-04 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing citizens to record by audio or video a traffic stop by law enforcement officers.
Title
Allowing citizens to record by audio or video a traffic stop by law enforcement officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; Senate Journal 17 |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 6/4/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 24 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Hearing: 5/12/15, Room 100, State House, 10:20 a.m.; Senate Calendar 19 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-11 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0114h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 778-779 |
2015-03-11 | House | Amendment #0114h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG. 778-779 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0114h for Mar 11 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar19, PG. 395 |
2015-02-25 | House | Executive Session: 3/3/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED==Public Hearing: 1/28/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED==Public Hearing: 1/27/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 12, PG. 216 |