NH HB291 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1883s and 1980s (Rep. M. Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study certain findings regarding hospice and palliative care.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study certain findings regarding hospice and palliative care.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 18 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - OTP (Y: 214 N: 140 NV: 7 Abs: 39) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 146 N: 208 NV: 7 Abs: 39) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-13HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1883s and 1980s (Rep. M. Smith): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 9
2019-05-23SenateSen. Carson moved Reconsideration on HB 291; Without Objection, HB 291 will be taken up after HB 631; Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2019-1883s, and 2019-1980s, Regular Calendar 21Y-2N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-23SenateSen. Carson Moved to Reconsider the following action taken by this Body: Rescind Order to Third Reading, and Reconsider the Vote on Ought to Pass with Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-15SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2019-1883s, and 2019-1980s, Regular Calendar 18Y-6N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateSen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2019-1980s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-15SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-1883s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/15/2019; Senate Journal 16
2019-05-09SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-1883s, 05/15/2019; Senate Calendar 22
2019-05-02SenateHearing: 05/07/2019, Room 100, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 21
2019-03-25SenateIntroduced 03/21/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-14HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 214-140 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 14
2019-03-14HouseAmendment # 2019-0767h: Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 146-208 03/14/2019 House Journal 9 P. 14
2019-03-06HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0767h (NT)
2019-03-06HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/14/2019 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 15 P. 7
2019-02-12HouseExecutive Session: 03/05/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2019-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/22/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208
2018-12-28HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 2 P. 44

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=794&sy=2019&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB291
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&id=749&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2019&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=749
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=87&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0291&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB291&ddlsponsors=&lsr=794
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=88&sy=2019&lb=H&eb=HB0291&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB291&ddlsponsors=&lsr=794
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=146&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0291&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB291&ddlsponsors=&lsr=794
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=151&sy=2019&lb=S&eb=HB0291&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2019&txtbillnumber=HB291&ddlsponsors=&lsr=794

Bill Comments

feedback