NH HB294 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study enforcement of the equal pay act provisions.
Title
Establishing a committee to study enforcement of the equal pay act provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 17 |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/14/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 8 |
2019-01-29 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-12-28 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 2 P. 44 |