NH HB295 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - II. Remainder Effective 01/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-25 - II. Remainder Effective 01/01/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring criminal background checks for volunteers and employees at youth skill camps.
Title
Requiring criminal background checks for volunteers and employees at youth skill camps.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-26 - House - C OF C #2107C (Y: 241 N: 114 NV: 25 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - OTP/AM 1021H (Y: 199 N: 150 NV: 36 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - OTP/AM 0450H (Y: 244 N: 112 NV: 14 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2013-03-27 - House - OTP/AM 1021H (Y: 199 N: 150 NV: 36 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - OTP/AM 0450H (Y: 244 N: 112 NV: 14 Abs: 27) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-25 | House | II. Remainder Effective 01/01/2014 |
2013-07-25 | House | I. RSA 485-A:25 as Amended by Section 3 Effective 08/23/2013 |
2013-07-25 | House | Signed By Governor 07/24/2013; Chapter 0250 |
2013-06-26 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 52, PG.1714 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Enrolled |
2013-06-26 | House | Conference Committee Report #2107c Adopted, Regular Calendar 241-114; House Journal 52, PG.1693-1695 |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 2107c; Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-20 | Senate | Conference Committee Report #2013-2107c; Senate Amendment + New Amendment, Filed |
2013-06-12 | House | Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/18/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-06-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Stiles, Reagan, Kelly |
2013-06-12 | Senate | Sen. Stiles Moved Accede to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-06-12 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps Suzanne Smith, Aguiar, Ahlgren, and Gottling [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1650 |
2013-06-12 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment #1703s and Requests C of C (Rep Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote [Recess of 6/5/13]; House Journal 49, PG.1650 |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 6/6/13; Senate Calendar 23 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | The Chair Rescinded OT3rdg |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 1703s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment 1703s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-1703s, 5/23/13; Senate Calendar 21 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Hearing: 4/30/13, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 17 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health, Education & Human Services |
2013-03-27 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #1021h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 199-150; House Journal 31, PG.1062-1064 |
2013-03-27 | House | Amendment #1021h: Amendment Adopted Division Vote 204-145; House Journal 31, PG.1062 |
2013-03-27 | House | Lay on Table (Rep Vaillancourt): Motion Failed Division Vote 165-184; House Journal 31, PG.1062 |
2013-03-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 25, PG.710 |
2013-03-20 | House | Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2013-1021h; House Calendar 25, PG.728 |
2013-03-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1021h for Mar 27 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 25, PG.710 |
2013-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 3/19/2013 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-03-07 | House | Public Hearing: 3/14/2013 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2013-03-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 3/19/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 104 |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 24, PG.686-689 |
2013-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0450h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 244-112; House Journal 24, PG.686-689 |
2013-03-06 | House | Amendment #0450h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 24, PG.686-689 |
2013-02-21 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 20, PG.420 |
2013-02-21 | House | Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2013-0450h; House Calendar 20, PG.448-449 |
2013-02-21 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0450h for Mar 6 (Vote 17-2; Part I Regular Calendar); House Calendar 20, PG.420 |
2013-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 2/19/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-02-08 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/14/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 2/7/2013 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-01-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 1/31/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 |
2013-01-22 | House | Public Hearing: 1/29/2013 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-01-03 | House | Introduced 1/3/2013 and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 12, PG.190 |