NH HB295 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2387h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2387h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removing a reference in the housing law to municipal agreements regarding the construction of parking facilities.
Title
Removing a reference in the housing law to municipal agreements regarding the construction of parking facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Catherine Cheney [R] | Rep. Barbara Griffin [R] | Rep. Peter Varney [R] | Rep. Valerie Fraser [R] |
Rep. Robert Knowles [R] | Rep. John Mullen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2387h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 9 |
2015-09-16 | House | Executive Session: 10/6/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-08-03 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/8/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-05-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 5/21/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-04-28 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/7/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-02-17 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 9:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 216 |