NH HB295 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Signed by Governor Hassan 04/25/2016; Chapter 21; Eff. 4/25/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-27 - Signed by Governor Hassan 04/25/2016; Chapter 21; Eff. 4/25/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Correcting a reference in the housing law to municipal agreements regarding the construction of parking facilities.
Title
Correcting a reference in the housing law to municipal agreements regarding the construction of parking facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Catherine Cheney [R] | Rep. Barbara Griffin [R] | Rep. Valerie Fraser [R] | Rep. John Mullen [R] |
Rep. Robert Knowles [R] | Rep. Peter Varney [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-27 | House | Signed by Governor Hassan 04/25/2016; Chapter 21; Eff. 4/25/2016 |
2016-04-11 | House | Enrolled 04/06/2016 House Journal 31 P. 25 |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/07/2016); Senate Journal 13 |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/31/2016; Senate Journal 11 |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/31/2016; Senate Calendar 12 |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Hearing: 03/23/2016, Rooms 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/18/2016 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 6 |
2016-01-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2387h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 48 |
2016-01-06 | House | Amendment #2015-2387h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 01/06/2016 House Journal 4 P. 48 |
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-2387h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 9 |
2015-09-16 | House | Executive Session: 10/6/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-08-03 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/8/2015 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-05-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 5/21/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-04-28 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 5/7/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-02-17 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Executive Session: 2/17/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-02-04 | House | Public Hearing: 2/12/2015 9:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 12, PG. 216 |