NH HB295 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to medical payments coverage under motor vehicle liability.
Title
Relative to medical payments coverage under motor vehicle liability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/08/2017 House Journal 9 P. 10 |
2017-02-16 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/08/2017 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 5 |
2017-02-02 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/07/2017 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-19 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/25/2017 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-17 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/24/2017 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2017-01-06 | House | Introduced 01/05/2017 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 3 P. 7 |