NH HB297 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 51; Eff: 08/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-11 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 51; Eff: 08/04/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to political advertisements on behalf of political committees or advocacy organizations.
Title
Relative to political advertisements on behalf of political committees or advocacy organizations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/05/2019; Chapter 51; Eff: 08/04/2019 |
2019-05-16 | House | Enrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 101 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/15/2019); Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Hearing: 04/10/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 8 |
2019-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 10 |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/14/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 4 |
2019-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2019-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2019 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2018-12-31 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 44 |