NH HB3 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Signed by Governor Sununu 09/26/2019; Chapter 345; Eff: 07/01/2019
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Signed by Governor Sununu 09/26/2019; Chapter 345; Eff: 07/01/2019
Summary
Making appropriations for the expenses of certain departments of the state for fiscal years ending June 30, 2020 and June 30, 2021.
Title
Making appropriations for the expenses of certain departments of the state for fiscal years ending June 30, 2020 and June 30, 2021.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-25 - House - OTP (Y: 327 N: 29 NV: 16 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 09/26/2019; Chapter 345; Eff: 07/01/2019 |
2019-09-25 | House | Enrolled 09/25/2019 House Journal 23 P. 20 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 09/25/2019); Senate Journal 23 |
2019-09-25 | House | Suspend House Rule to allow Introduction and Consideration (Reps. Wallner, Hinch): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 334-25 by necessary two-thirds vote 09/25/2019 House Journal 23 P. 2 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 09/25/2019; Senate Journal 23 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Sen. D'Allesandro Moved Ought to Pass; 09/25/2019; Senate Journal 23 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved Introduction; Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 09/25/2019; Senate Journal 23 |
2019-09-25 | Senate | Sen. Feltes Moved to suspend all rules necessary to permit the consideration of HB 3 at the present time and if adopted, to permit third reading and final passage in the early session, 2/3 necessary, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 09/25/2019; Senate Journal 23 |
2019-09-25 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 327-29 09/25/2019 House Journal 23 P. 4 |
2019-09-25 | House | Introduced and Adopted (without objection) 09/25/2019 House Journal 23 P. 4 |