NH HB311 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-26 - House Retained Bill - Continued Executive Session: 11/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-26 - House Retained Bill - Continued Executive Session: 11/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to solar renewable energy.
Title
Relative to solar renewable energy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-26 | House Retained Bill - Continued Executive Session: 11/1/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-10-11 | House Retained Bill - Executive Session: 10/25/2011 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-10-11 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/25/2011 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-08-18 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 9/13/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301-303 | |
2011-04-12 | House Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 4/26/2011 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302-304 | |
2011-03-02 | House Retained in Committee; House Calendar 27, PG.825 | |
2011-02-16 | House Continued Public Hearing: 3/1/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 ==Executive Session To Follow== | |
2011-01-27 | House ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 2/1/2011 3:30 PM Legislative Office Building 304 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-01-26 | House ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 2/2/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 | |
2011-01-21 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Science, Technology and Energy; House Journal 11, PG. 182 |